Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from EET/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |