Senate | 02/15/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Referred to TCA/AEN, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |