House
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1284) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-15-23 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HLT, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 334) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1106) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|