Hawaii 2023 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1048 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 1048 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023 STATE OF HAWAII A BILL FOR AN ACT relating to PUBLIC EMPLOYEE COMPENSATION. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
22
33 THE SENATE S.B. NO. 1048
44 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023
55 STATE OF HAWAII
66
77 THE SENATE
88
99 S.B. NO.
1010
1111 1048
1212
1313 THIRTY-SECOND LEGISLATURE, 2023
1414
1515
1616
1717 STATE OF HAWAII
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727
2828
2929
3030
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT
3232
3333
3434
3535
3636
3737 relating to PUBLIC EMPLOYEE COMPENSATION.
3838
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF HAWAII:
4444
4545
4646
4747 SECTION 1. Section 78-13, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows: "(a) Unless otherwise provided by law, all officers and employees shall be paid at least semimonthly except that substitute teachers, part-time hourly rated teachers of adult and evening classes, and other part-time, intermittent, or casual employees may be paid once a month [and that the governor, upon reasonable notice and upon determination that the payroll payment basis should be converted from predicted payroll to after-the-fact payroll, may allow a one-time once a month payroll payment to all public officers and employees to effect a conversion to after-the-fact payroll as follows: (1) The implementation of the after-the-fact payroll will commence with the June 30, 1998, pay day, which will be delayed to July 1, 1998; (2) The July 15, 1998, pay day will be delayed to July 17, 1998; (3) The July 31, 1998, pay day will be delayed to August 3, 1998; (4) The August 14, 1998, pay day will be delayed to August 19, 1998; (5) The August 31, 1998, pay day will be delayed to September 4, 1998; (6) The September 15, 1998, pay day will be delayed to September 18, 1998; and (7) Thereafter, pay days will be on the fifth and the twentieth of every month. If the fifth and the twentieth fall on a state holiday, Saturday, or Sunday, the pay day will be the immediately preceding weekday.] ; provided that the payroll payment basis shall be converted from after-the-fact payroll to predicted payroll and shall commence with the August 4, 2023, pay day, which shall be paid on July 31, 2023, and thereafter, pay days shall be on the fifteenth and last day of every month. If the fifteenth or the last day of the month falls on a state holiday, Saturday, or Sunday, the pay day shall be the immediately preceding weekday. The implementation of the [after-the-fact] predicted payroll shall [not] be subject to negotiation under chapter 89." SECTION 2. This Act does not affect rights and duties that matured, penalties that were incurred, and proceedings that were begun before its effective date. SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored. SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect upon its approval. INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
4848
4949 SECTION 1. Section 78-13, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is amended by amending subsection (a) to read as follows:
5050
5151 "(a) Unless otherwise provided by law, all officers and employees shall be paid at least semimonthly except that substitute teachers, part-time hourly rated teachers of adult and evening classes, and other part-time, intermittent, or casual employees may be paid once a month [and that the governor, upon reasonable notice and upon determination that the payroll payment basis should be converted from predicted payroll to after-the-fact payroll, may allow a one-time once a month payroll payment to all public officers and employees to effect a conversion to after-the-fact payroll as follows:
5252
5353 (1) The implementation of the after-the-fact payroll will commence with the June 30, 1998, pay day, which will be delayed to July 1, 1998;
5454
5555 (2) The July 15, 1998, pay day will be delayed to July 17, 1998;
5656
5757 (3) The July 31, 1998, pay day will be delayed to August 3, 1998;
5858
5959 (4) The August 14, 1998, pay day will be delayed to August 19, 1998;
6060
6161 (5) The August 31, 1998, pay day will be delayed to September 4, 1998;
6262
6363 (6) The September 15, 1998, pay day will be delayed to September 18, 1998; and
6464
6565 (7) Thereafter, pay days will be on the fifth and the twentieth of every month. If the fifth and the twentieth fall on a state holiday, Saturday, or Sunday, the pay day will be the immediately preceding weekday.]
6666
6767 ; provided that the payroll payment basis shall be converted from after-the-fact payroll to predicted payroll and shall commence with the August 4, 2023, pay day, which shall be paid on July 31, 2023, and thereafter, pay days shall be on the fifteenth and last day of every month. If the fifteenth or the last day of the month falls on a state holiday, Saturday, or Sunday, the pay day shall be the immediately preceding weekday.
6868
6969 The implementation of the [after-the-fact] predicted payroll shall [not] be subject to negotiation under chapter 89."
7070
7171 SECTION 2. This Act does not affect rights and duties that matured, penalties that were incurred, and proceedings that were begun before its effective date.
7272
7373 SECTION 3. Statutory material to be repealed is bracketed and stricken. New statutory material is underscored.
7474
7575 SECTION 4. This Act shall take effect upon its approval.
7676
7777
7878
7979 INTRODUCED BY: _____________________________
8080
8181 INTRODUCED BY:
8282
8383 _____________________________
8484
8585
8686
8787
8888
8989 Report Title: Salaries; Public Officers and Employees Description: Repeals payroll day for public officers and employees by requiring them to be paid pursuant to a predicted payroll schedule, rather than an after-the-fact payroll schedule. The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.
9090
9191
9292
9393
9494
9595 Report Title:
9696
9797 Salaries; Public Officers and Employees
9898
9999
100100
101101 Description:
102102
103103 Repeals payroll day for public officers and employees by requiring them to be paid pursuant to a predicted payroll schedule, rather than an after-the-fact payroll schedule.
104104
105105
106106
107107
108108
109109
110110
111111 The summary description of legislation appearing on this page is for informational purposes only and is not legislation or evidence of legislative intent.