LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1152
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1152
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1152
Action History
Senate
02/07/2023
The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Senate
02/07/2023
The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Senate
02/03/2023
The committee(s) on HHS/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 2:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/27/2023
Referred to HHS/HOU, WAM.
Senate
01/23/2023
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/20/2023
Introduced.