House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 384) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Re-Referred to HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Re-Referred to HRE, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HRE/GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|