Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Act 052, 06/02/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152).
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Act 052, on 06/02/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1152).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Gates, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 128) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 128).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Yamashita, Kitagawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 3:45PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 4:45PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Takayama.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 775).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Gates, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (9) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2154), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lamosao, Alcos, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kila; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-05-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kila, Kong, Matsumoto, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1575) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Souza; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 391) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella, Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|