Senate | 02/16/2023 | The committee on EET deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/EET deferred the measure until 02-16-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to AEN/EET, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |