Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 081, 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Act 081, on 06/14/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 906).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-19-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-19-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 567).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Deferred one day 04-03-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 400) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 816) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|