Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 3:55PM; Conference room 016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 10:45AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 10:45AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 10:45AM in conference room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Evslin, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Elefante.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 780).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2120) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-03-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|