Senate
|
07/07/2023
|
Act 255, 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
|
|
|
House
|
07/07/2023
|
Act 255, on 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 23) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 23).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Keohokalole, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-23 2:35PM; Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Lamosao, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 911).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 713).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Deferred one day 04-06-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-05-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1889) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1407), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-17-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 426) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|