LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1388
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1388
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1388
Action History
Senate
02/06/2023
The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Senate
02/03/2023
The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
Senate
02/01/2023
Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
Senate
01/30/2023
Referred to WTL, JDC.
Senate
01/25/2023
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/25/2023
Introduced.