House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 17 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 53). | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | One Day Notice 03-03-23. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 716) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |