LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB14
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB14
Action History
Senate
02/14/2023
The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Senate
02/10/2023
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/25/2023
Re-Referred to CPN, JDC.
Senate
01/20/2023
Referred to CPN/PSM, JDC.
Senate
01/18/2023
Introduced and passed First Reading.
Senate
01/12/2023
Pending Introduction.