Senate | 02/14/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported from WTL/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 266) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 1:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Pending Introduction. |