Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 221, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 221, on 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Floor amendment failed with Noes, 1 (Representative(s) Ichiyama). Excused, 8 (Representative(s) Aiu, Gates, Lowen, Martinez, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 14 offered by Rep. Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 186) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 186).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tarnas, Poepoe, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye, Aquino, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 2:35PM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 11:05AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-23 9:15AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-23 11:20AM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Tarnas, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Re-referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 34
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Inouye, Aquino Co-Chairs; DeCoite.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 570).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1876), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1476) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 443) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1054) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|