LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1453
Action History
HI
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1453
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1453
Action History
Senate
02/16/2023
The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Senate
02/14/2023
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-16-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225.
Senate
02/09/2023
The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
Senate
01/30/2023
Referred to GVO, JDC.
Senate
01/25/2023
Passed First Reading.
Senate
01/25/2023
Introduced.