House
|
03/17/2023
|
Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Received from Governor re: Consideration Request (Gov. Msg. No. 3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to ECD/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 662) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Lee, Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to AEN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|