Senate | 02/16/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported from AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |