Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Act 128, 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2023
|
Act 128, on 06/23/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1229).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 34).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-23 2:35PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 572).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Deferred one day 04-03-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1626) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 464) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|