Senate | 03/01/2023 | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Re-Referred to TCA, CPN/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to TCA/HHS, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Pending Introduction. |