House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 467) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|