House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Kim, Wakai.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 793).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Matsumoto, Pierick, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2144) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-05-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Kong, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1591), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-22-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Kong voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from TOU/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, La Chica, Lamosao, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU/ECD on Thursday, 03-16-23 9:45AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to TOU/ECD, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 477) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Ihara, Kanuha, Keohokalole, McKelvey, Richards. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 967) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|