House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 17 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 478) in amended form (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-10-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 229. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |