Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS deferred the measure until 02-15-23 1:00PM; CR 225. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Re-Referred to HHS/LBT, CPN/WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HHS/LBT, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |