Senate | 02/15/2023 | The recommendation was not adopted. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Re-Referred to AEN, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Referred to AEN/HHS, CPN. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Introduced. |