House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Pass First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 41). | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Dela Cruz, Kidani, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Wakai. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | One Day Notice 03-03-23. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 679) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Pending Introduction. |