Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Act 014, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Act 014, on 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1114).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-03-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 680) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-16-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|