House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, FIN , referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Lee). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
One Day Notice 02-16-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Kim, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-10-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|