Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 2:45PM; Conference Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Elefante.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Kong, Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 538).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1787) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|