House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Quinlan, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HET, JHA, FIN , referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-03-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 179) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred to HRE, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|