House
|
04/17/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 891).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 675).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1971) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 127) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|