Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Awa. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to HHS/PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced. |