Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Act 015, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Act 015, on 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 478).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1789), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1344), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HUS, JHA , referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 130).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
One Day Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 998) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 510) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HHS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|