Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Pending Introduction. |