House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 64) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 832) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|