House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 15
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
One Day Notice 02-09-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to AEN/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|