Senate | 02/14/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to WTL/PSM, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |