House
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 181) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|