House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 976).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Fukunaga, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima Chair; Sayama, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 683).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Marten voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Lowen, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Deferred one day 04-06-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Ganaden, Kapela, Lowen, Marten, Perruso voting no (6) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1871) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Lowen; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:30PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 182) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 810) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|