Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 194, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
|
|
|
House
|
07/05/2023
|
Act 194, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 31) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 31).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Sayama, Evslin, Kapela, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Keohokalole, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 972).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 829).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Perruso, Sayama Co-Chairs; Evslin, Kapela, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 545).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1879), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-20-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 03-17-23 3:35PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HET, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, McKelvey, Richards. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 855) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to LBT, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|