Senate | 03/01/2023 | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to JDC, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |