Senate | 02/10/2023 | The recommendation was not adopted. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chang ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-10-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |