House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, CPC, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 196) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM, with Senator Elefante voting "Aye, with reservations".
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 93) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-23 2:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|