Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Act 061, 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Act 061, on 06/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Enrolled to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 169) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 169).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kitagawa, La Chica, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 4:31PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 3:20PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; La Chica, Marten, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 595).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1927), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1367) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 23) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 02-21-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 654) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 3:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EDU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 140) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EDU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on EDU will hold a public decision making on 02-08-23 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to EDU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|