House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 201) in amended form (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Re-Referred to HOU, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on HOU will hold a public decision making on 02-02-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HOU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|