Senate | 02/28/2023 | The committee on EET deferred the measure. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Re-Referred to EET. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 309) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-09-23 10:29AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Introduced. |