Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-06-23 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced.
|
|
|