House
|
04/28/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 2:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 2:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 3:30PM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Sayama, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Onishi, Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 911).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate disagrees with House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 725).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2088) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1305) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-15-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Pass First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 916) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to HHS, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced and passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2023
|
Pending Introduction.
|
|
|