Senate | 02/17/2023 | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 532) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2023 | Pending Introduction. |